REPORT NUMBER 278 OF THE AGENDA COMMITTEE
Monday, May 31, 2021
To the Academic Board,
University of Toronto
Your Committee reports that it held a virtual meeting on Monday, May 31, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. with the following members present:
PRESENT: Nicholas Terpstra (Chair), Douglas McDougall (Vice-Chair), Cheryl Regehr (Vice-President and Provost), Mark Schmuckler (Vice-Provost, Academic Programs and Innovations in Undergraduate Education), Markus Bussmann, Samantha Chang, Jan Mahrt-Smith, Nicholas Rule
REGRETS: Ernest W.N. Lam
SECRETARIAT: Tracey Gameiro, Secretary, Agenda Committee
IN ATTENDANCE: Archana Sridhar (Assistant Provost, Office of the Vice-President and Provost)
The Meeting was held in Closed Session
- Chair’s Remarks
The Chair welcomed members and thanked them for their time. He identified the Committee had two items of business to conduct.
- Approval of the Report of the Previous Meeting
Report 277 from the meeting of May 18, 2021, was approved.
- Business Arising from the Report of the Previous Meeting
There was no business arising from the Report of the previous meeting
- Date of the Next Meeting – Wednesday, June 23, 2021
The Chair stated that the final meeting would be held on June 23, 2021, from 3:00 – 4:00 p.m.
- Other Business
There were no items of other business.
The Committee moved IN CAMERA.
- Academic Administrative Appointments
On a motion duly moved, seconded and carried
YOUR COMMITTEE APPROVED
The following academic administrative appointments.
FACULTY OF ARTS AND SCIENCE
Associate Professor Sarah Finkelstein
Chair
Department of Earth Sciences
July 1, 2021 to June 30, 2026
Professor Robert Jerrard
Chair and Graduate Chair
Department of Mathematics
July 1, 2021 to June 30, 2026
ONTARIO INSTITUTE FOR STUDIES IN EDUCATION
Associate Professor Sarfaroz Niyozov
Acting Associate Dean, Programs
July 1, 2021 to June 30, 2022
SCHOOL OF GRADUATE STUDIES
Associate Professor Joshua Barker
Dean
July 1, 2022 to June 30, 2027
(renewal)
Professor Martin Pickave
Graduate Chair
Department of Philosophy
July 01, 2021 to June 30, 2027
(renewal; includes one year leave)
UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO MISSISSAUGA
Associate Professor Teaching Stream Tracey Bowen
Acting Director
Institute of Communication, Culture, Information, and Technology
July 1, 2021 to August 31, 2022
Associate Professor Sarah Sharma
Director
Institute of Communication, Culture, Information, and Technology
July 01, 2021 to June 30, 2027
(includes a year on sabbatical; official start is September 1, 2022)
THE COMMITTEE RETURNED TO CLOSED SESSION.
The meeting adjourned at 3:12 p.m.
May 31, 2021